RIVER VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
River Village Hall committee hold, mini market once a month, the income enables us to maintain the hall, to hire out to local societies such as River WI, Gardeners, Karate, Pilates, Kung Fu, Keep Fit, Dancing for Small Children, These activities are supported by all ages of River residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 01 July 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALISON JOAN DALE | Chair | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Grayling Elaine Grayling | Trustee | 17 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
JEAN THOMAS | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Pat Hicks | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.63k | £19.63k | £20.00k | £21.00k | £2.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.56k | £12.92k | £18.03k | £20.00k | £22.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 5TH FEBRUARY 1964 AND AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 5TH MAY 1976
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF RIVER AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTRINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
RIVER AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 DOURSIDE
RIVER
DOVER
CT17 0UX
- Phone:
- 01304823803
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window