WELLS CATHEDRAL PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity Number: 271596
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The trust receives donations and legacies, invests unused income and disburses funds exclusively for the preservation and conservation of the fabric of Wells Cathedral.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £25,907
Total expenditure: £18,039

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset
  • North Somerset
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 July 1976: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
EDWARD GEORGE HOBHOUSE Chair 07 October 2019
KING'S SCHOOL, BRUTON
Received: On time
BRUTON SCHOOL FOR GIRLS
Received: On time
The Very Reverend Toby Christopher Wright Trustee 07 October 2024
WELLS CATHEDRAL SCHOOL LIMITED
Received: On time
The Revd Dr Megan DAffern Trustee 07 October 2024
WYNNE WILLSON SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
Emily Showering Trustee 02 October 2022
HUGH SEXEY'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
SEXEY'S SCHOOL, BRUTON
Received: On time
WINCANTON COMMUNITY VENTURE
Received: On time
Annie Maw Trustee 02 October 2022
None on record
Edward William George Bayntun-Coward DL Trustee 02 October 2017
American Museum & Gardens
Received: On time
Paper Foundation
Received: On time
THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF ST ANDREW IN WELLS
Recently registered
Esmeralda Jane Martin Trustee 03 October 2016
None on record
Martin William Llewellyn Trustee 06 October 2014
None on record
THE HONOURABLE THOMAS FLETCHER REES MOGG Trustee
None on record
Robert Nicholas Foord Drewett Trustee
High Sheriff of Somerset Charitable Trust
Received: On time
ROYAL AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY OF ENGLAND
Received: On time
THE HILBORNE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ROYAL AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY OF THE COMMONWEALTH
Received: On time
GRATEFUL SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE LANGFORD TRUST FOR ANIMAL HEALTH AND WELFARE
Received: On time
INNOVATION FOR AGRICULTURE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £31.87k £19.03k £15.93k £14.50k £25.91k
Total expenditure £6.20k £22.09k £160.17k £5.04k £18.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 22 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 Stoberry Crescent
WELLS
Somerset
BA5 2TG
Phone:
07704290252
Website:

No information available