Financial history ACHIEZER VA'ACHISOMOCH TRUST

Charity number: 271610
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £16.74k £50.32k £65.19k £37.74k £71.02k
Total expenditure £20.66k £41.31k £61.45k £49.98k £66.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A