RED DIAMONDS

Charity number: 271617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide sports and social facilities for disabled people.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £9,953
Total expenditure: £7,346

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bracknell Forest
  • Wokingham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 July 1976: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • Red Diamond (Working name)
  • WOKINGHAM, BRACKNELL AND DISTRICT SPORTS ASSOCIATION FOR THE DISABLED (Working name)
  • RED DIAMOND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ed Swindle Chair 18 September 2021
None on record
Jenny Warrick Trustee 18 September 2021
None on record
Richard Woodgate Trustee 18 September 2021
None on record
VALERIE JANE CODD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £7.17k £1.61k £3.05k £9.95k £9.95k
Total expenditure £8.22k £688 £1.27k £7.70k £7.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 06 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 21 April 2024 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 22 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 22 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 05 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
17 Harts Leap Close
SANDHURST
Berkshire
GU47 8PB
Phone:
01344773738
Website:

reddiamond.org.uk