Trustees ST JUST WORKING MENS CLUB
Charity number: 271650

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEREMY EDWARDS | Chair | 05 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Gowan | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Roger Nicholas | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Howard Eddy | Trustee | 07 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID TERRENCE TONKIN | Trustee | 25 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Frank Stephens | Trustee | 03 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROGER LESLIE CARGEEG | Trustee | 24 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY HOLMAN | Trustee | 24 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
FARMER MORRIS | Trustee | 24 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY BOYNS | Trustee | 05 May 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.