SUSSEX CHORUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Choir's object is to provide,improve,develop and maintain public education in appreciation of the art and science of choral music in all its aspects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £1,200 from 2 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 20 July 1976: Standard registration
- SUSSEX CHORUS (Working name)
- DITCHLING CHORAL SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW FOX | Chair | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julia Roberts | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Barker | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Barnaby | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Jill Furber | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Wilson | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Seddon | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Cooper | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Peskett | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Rea | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID TETTERSELL | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy David Jalie | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
richard moon | Trustee | 30 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.37k | £2.12k | £25.47k | £29.68k | £35.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.39k | £4.03k | £19.14k | £29.62k | £29.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £500 | £750 | £1.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 14 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 14 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 JUN 1975 AS AMENDED ON 11 MAY 1976 AS AMENDED ON 24 OCT 1977 AS AMENDED ON 26 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ORDER TO FOSTER THE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Funnell Drive
HAYWARDS HEATH
RH17 7DF
- Phone:
- 07799066481
- Email:
- secretary@sussexchorus.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window