Trustees THE WILD FLOWER SOCIETY

Charity Number: 271694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DR PETER JOHN LLEWELLYN Chair 01 September 2018
None on record
Nicholas William Aston Trustee 07 September 2024
None on record
Carol Maria Armstrong Trustee 07 September 2024
None on record
Heather Fay Banks Trustee 02 September 2023
None on record
Kenneth Clifford Southall Trustee 02 September 2023
None on record
Barbara Lewis Trustee 03 September 2022
None on record
Steven David Andrew Little Trustee 03 September 2022
None on record
Dr Helen Margaret Dignum Trustee 31 October 2020
None on record
Janet John Trustee 03 September 2016
None on record
DR NICHOLA JANE HAWKINS Trustee
None on record
ROBIN ALASTAIR BLADES Trustee
None on record