FRIENDS OF THE CANTERBURY MUSEUMS

Charity number: 271700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Support of the Canterbury Museums and their role and educational activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 September 1976: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE FRIENDS OF THE ROYAL MUSEUM, CANTERBURY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Gilbert Webster FCA DChA Trustee
CANTERBURY CHRISTIAN COUNCIL LIMITED
Received: On time
UNITED KINGDOM NATIONAL COMMITTEE OF THE INTERNATIONAL COUNCIL ON MONUMENTS AND SITES
Received: On time
INTERNATIONAL COUNCIL ON MONUMENTS AND SITES, UK
Received: 5 days late
MAYNARD AND COTTON'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
MAYNARD AND COTTON'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
EWIN'S SUNDAY SCHOOL PRIZE FUND
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SAMUEL DANIEL EWINS
Received: On time
REVEREND CHARLES HAIRBY BARTON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
UNITED MUNICIPAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
CANTERBURY COMMEMORATION SOCIETY
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF CANTERBURY MUSEUMS
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
THE INTERNATIONAL MONUMENTS TRUST
Received: On time
LYNNETTE GOSLING Trustee
FRIENDS OF CANTERBURY MUSEUMS
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 31 October 2024 184 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 27 June 2023 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 18 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 01 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
48 St. Martins Hill
CANTERBURY
Kent
CT1 1PP
Phone:
01227 451281
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available