Accounts and annual returns HOME WARMTH FOR THE AGED BENEVOLENT FUND (HWA)

Charity number: 271735
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2018 09 November 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 27 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required