REDBRIDGE TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 271746
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

RTN provides a free weekly audio edition on USB memory stick for the blind and partially sighted who live in Redbridge and those who lived in Redbridge and have moved out of the borough but want to stay in touch. The edition contains both local news and magazine features.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £1,058
Total expenditure: £3,827

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Redbridge

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 August 1976: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RTN (Working name)
  • REDBRIDGE TALKING NEWSPAPER (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Clare Gailans Trustee 04 May 2020
THE VALENTINE SINGERS
Received: On time
Paul Campbell Trustee 28 May 2019
None on record
Stephanie Tomlinson Trustee 28 May 2019
None on record
Anji Patel Trustee 22 May 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £1.79k £2.98k £20.54k £1.87k £1.06k
Total expenditure £3.06k £2.70k £6.12k £3.64k £3.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £249 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £249 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 01 February 2024 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 23 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 08 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 09 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
8 Melstock Avenue
UPMINSTER
RM14 3UP
Phone:
01708 223741