CHELMSFORD CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Chelmsford Civic Society is a member of Civic Voice. The aims of The Chelmsford Civic Society are to stimulate public interest in and appreciation of the history, appearance and character of Chelmsford.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 18 August 1976: Standard registration
- THE CHELMSFORD SOCIETY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MALCOLM NOBLE | Chair | 23 May 2011 |
|
|||||
Kevin Ian Miller | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|||||
JENNIFER WEBB | Trustee | 01 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HAMMOND | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.64k | £6.60k | £8.97k | £19.35k | £5.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.48k | £6.66k | £9.09k | £16.60k | £7.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 23 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/03/1971 AS AMENDED ON 27/03/1974 AS AMENDED ON 02/04/1975 AS AMENDED ON 27/05/2010
Charitable objects
1) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN, APPRECIATION OF AND CARE OF THE APPEARANCE, HISTORY AND CHARACTER OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 2) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 3) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
CHELMSFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 ROXWELL ROAD
CHELMSFORD
CM1 2PP
- Phone:
- 07720426801
- Email:
- 777millk@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window