COMMUNITY OF THE SISTERS OF THE CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Community aims to lead the Religious life. The Community is active in prayer, religious education and pastoral work expressed in many ways.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Bristol City
- Harrow
- Kent
- North Somerset
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Australia
- Canada
- Solomon Islands
Governance
- 06 August 1976: Standard registration
- 26 September 2012: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 26 September 2012: Funds transferred to 200240 CHURCH EXTENSION ASSOCIATION (INCORPORATED)
- SISTERS OF THE CHURCH (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2007 | 31/10/2008 | 31/10/2009 | 31/10/2010 | 31/10/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £216.92k | £220.93k | £275.13k | £189.18k | £227.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £254.13k | £225.12k | £248.19k | £245.54k | £1.47m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2011 | 24 August 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2011 | 09 March 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2010 | 26 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2010 | 06 April 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2009 | 14 May 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2009 | 26 August 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2008 | 04 August 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2008 | 07 August 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
THE CONSTITUTIONS OF THE SISTERS OF THE CHURCH 1946
Charitable objects
THE COMMUNITY FUNDS SHALL BE APPLIED TO THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SISTERHOOD AND TO THE CARRYING ON OF SUCH UNDERTAKINGS IN CONNECTION WITH THE SISTERHOOD AND THE CHURCH EXTENSION ASSOCIATION, AND TO BENEFACTIONS FOR SUCH OTHER KINDRED AND PHILANTHROPIC OBJECTS AS THE MOTHER SUPERIOR AND THE COUNCIL MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT TO SUPPORT OR CONTRIBUTE TO.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window