Accounts and annual returns TOLLEMACHE (BUCKMINSTER) CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 271795
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 02 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 02 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 07 February 2023 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 31 January 2024 360 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 02 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 02 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window