Financial history MERSEA ISLAND MUSEUM TRUST

Charity Number: 271818
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £16.31k £3.79k £21.11k £14.87k £14.74k
Total expenditure £8.32k £8.19k £17.88k £16.55k £10.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A £2.78k N/A N/A