Accounts and annual returns THE PLYMOUTH ARCHITECTURAL TRUST

Charity Number: 271850
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2024 366 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 22 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required