WINDSOR TALKING NEWSPAPER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide persons who are either permanently or temporarily blind or partially-sighted or otherwise visually impaired, weekly recordings based on the news and other items from local newspapers or other information sources, serving Windsor, Maidenhead, Slough and surrounding areas. Recordings shall be distributed through the free post facilities available under Royal Mail regulations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Slough
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 24 August 1976: Standard registration
- 06 February 2024: Funds received from 285948 THE SLOUGH AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIAT...
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Bailey | Chair | 26 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Eleanor Bailey | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Andrew OWENS | Trustee | 15 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Linda Evans | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £550 | £250 | £2.88k | £2.86k | £7.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.56k | £388 | £1.95k | £2.17k | £2.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 4TH AUGUST 1976
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE BLIND, OR THE PARTIALLY BLIND, OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN, BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN EFFECT WINDSOR AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Windsor Talking Newspaper
New Windsor Community Association
Hanover Way
WINDSOR
Berkshire
SL4 5NW
- Phone:
- 07976575406
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window