CHIPPENHAM AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Producing and providing local free talking newspapers for blind, visually impaired and housebound people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 30 September 1976: Standard registration
- CHIPPENHAM TALKING NEWSPAPER (Working name)
- CHIPPENHAM TAPES FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
- MALMESBURY TALKING NEWSPAPER MELKSHAM TALKING NEWSPAPER (Working name)
- MELKSHAM TALKING NEWSPAPER (Working name)
- CHIPPENHAM AND DISTRICT TAPE FELLOWSHIP FOR THE HANDICAPPED AND BLIND ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- CHIPPINHAM AND DISTRICT TAPE FELLOWSHIP FOR THE HANDICAPPED ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FRANCES MARGARET ALEXANDER | Chair |
|
||||||
ANGELA MARY GEE | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE PRETORIA ANNE LAMBERT | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Reed | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Sage | Trustee | 06 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brian Anthony Heath | Trustee | 06 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET REES | Trustee | 26 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHERYLL ANN EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £724 | £1.63k | £2.64k | £3.52k | £1.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.97k | £1.13k | £2.72k | £1.88k | £2.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH JUNE 1976 AS AMENDED 6TH JUNE 1984 AND 26 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF BLIND, VISUALLY IMPAIRED, DISABLED OR HOUSEBOUND PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY:- (A) PRODUCING AND PROVIDING FREE AUDIO TALKING NEWSPAPERS, MAGAZINES, ENTERTAINMENT PROGRAMMES AND INFORMATION PACKS THROUGH THE MEDIA OF AUDIO CASSETTE TAPES, COMPACT DISCS, COMPUTER PROGRAMMES OR ANY OTHER RELEVANT ELECTRONIC FORMATS;- (B) ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF THE EQUIPMENT REQUIRED BY LISTENERS TO ENABLE THEM TO LISTEN TO THE AUDIO PROGRAMMES PRODUCED AND SUPPLIED BY THE CHARITY;- (C) USING THE WORKING TITLES OF CHIPPENHAM TALKING NEWSPAPERS, MALMESBURY TALKING NEWSPAPERS OR ANY OTHER WORKING TITLES WHICH MAY BE APPROPRIATE AND LEGALLY PERMISSIBLE TO ENABLE THE CHARITY'S AUDIO PROGRAMMES TO BE EASILY IDENTIFIED AND RECOGNISED
Area of benefit
WILTSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Cary Glen
Chippenham
SN15 3TY
- Phone:
- 01249659305
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window