Financial history RUSSELL SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 271907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £19.99m £19.99m £23.04m £31.02m £30.34m
Total expenditure £18.94m £18.96m £21.68m £25.76m £28.58m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £38.41k £52.57k £24.14k £3.17m £0
Income - Other trading activities £262.34k £77.41k £528.57k £851.06k £944.77k
Income - Charitable activities £18.92m £19.28m £22.45m £26.46m £29.72m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £38.53k £537.66k £220.14k
Income - Other £767.37k £583.37k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £18.72m £18.86m £21.39m £25.20m £27.84m
Expenditure - Raising funds £221.19k £94.31k £292.00k £556.54k £745.98k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0