Friends of Origin Housing

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The income of the charity is applied generally or individually to assist in meeting the charitable aims of Origin Housing Association and to provide assistance to individuals and communities who are in necessitous circumstances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
- Throughout London
Governance
- 10 September 1976: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF ST PANCRAS HOUSING (Working name)
- SPH Friends (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF ST PANCRAS (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF THE ST PANCRAS HOUSING ASSOCIATION IN CAMDEN (Previous name)
- SPH FRIENDS (Previous name)
- THE FRIENDS OF ST PANCRAS HOUSING (Previous name)
- THE FRIENDS OF THE ST PANCRAS HOUSING (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Puddle | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Marcus Hulme | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Kirkland | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Bartlett | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Waterer | Trustee | 15 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALAN RAMSDALE | Trustee | 29 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR MALCOLM HOLMES | Trustee | 18 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ASHOK PATEL | Trustee | 13 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.47k | £257.58k | £1.58k | £54.97k | £8.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.76k | £33.91k | £21.14k | £39.23k | £28.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 14 APRIL 1976 AND AMENDED ON 17 MARCH 1999 , 17 SEPTEMBER 2002 AND 8 DECEMBER 2004 as amended on 01 Feb 2021 as amended on 01 Mar 2021 as amended on 06 May 2022
Charitable objects
To assist the charitable works of Origin Housing, previously known as St Pancras and Humanist Housing Association ("the Association"), and any subsidiaries of the Association as long as its objectives remain charitable and to support projects for the benefit of local communities in the areas that Origin Housing operates and to assist any other charity or charities in such manner being charitable and to such extent as the trustees shall decide.
Area of benefit
CENTRAL LONDON NORTH OF THE THAMES, NORTH LONDON AND HERTFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Origin Housing (Care & Support)
St. Richards House
110 Eversholt Street
LONDON
NW1 1BS
- Phone:
- 07971670789
- Email:
- secretary@originfriends.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window