THE SWANN-MORTON FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education through study and research in the fields of surgery and medicine to individuals, groups, organisations and other charities engaged in the care, support and the relief of suffering of the sick, infirm, injured, handicapped or disabled.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 September 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEORGE RODGERS | Trustee | 07 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL MCGINLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH GILMOUR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.04k | £80.00k | £85.00k | £93.49k | £85.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.19k | £81.23k | £74.83k | £86.15k | £97.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12TH MAY 1976
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF STUDY AND RESEARCH IN THE FIELDS OF SURGERY AND MEDICINE AND WHERE APPROPRIATE THE PUBLICATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY THINK FIT.... (3) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE PRECEDING WORDS OF THIS PRESENT SUB-CLAUSE) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND OTHER HELP TO ANY PERSONS WHO ARE EMPLOYEES OR FORMER EMPLOYEES OF W R SWANN & CO LIMITED.... (4) THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONG THOSE WHO ARE SICK INFIRM INJURED OR OTHERWISE PHYSICALLY OF MENTALLY HANDICAPPED OR DISABLED (5) THE PROMOTION OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE TRUST OR COMPANY FOR THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING OR DISTRESS. (FOR DETAILS SEE TRUST DEED).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SWANN MORTON LTD
OWLERTON GREEN
SHEFFIELD
S6 2BJ
- Phone:
- 01142344231
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window