Financial history FENSTANTON CHURCH ESTATE

Charity number: 271926
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £589 £610 £631 £635 £644
Total expenditure £589 £610 £631 £635 £644
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A