THE LONDON ARMENIAN COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity Number: 271931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide funds in accordance with the objects of the Charity and financial contributions to the Armenian Community Council of the United Kingdom and towards the expenses of the Armenian community's Armenian language Sunday school in London

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £10,216
Total expenditure: £8,400

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 September 1976: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ARMAND ABRAMIAN Chair 12 July 2018
NAVASARTIAN CHARITY TRUST
Received: On time
HOMENETMEN LONDON
Received: On time
LONDON ARMENIAN POOR RELIEF SOCIETY TRUST
Received: 43 days late
THE ARMENIAN COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
Dr HRATCH KOUYOUMJIAN Trustee 12 July 2018
THE ARMENIAN COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
LONDON ARMENIAN POOR RELIEF SOCIETY TRUST
Received: 43 days late
Adom Hakoob Saboonchian Trustee 12 July 2018
None on record
Dr KARNIK TARVERDI Trustee 12 July 2018
KEVORK TAHTAYAN ARMENIAN COMMUNITY SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Vasken Kassemdjian Trustee 12 July 2018
None on record
Dr Karnik Agop Derderian Trustee 12 July 2018
None on record
KEVORK OHANIAN Trustee 12 July 2018
None on record
MARAL MARIE JAKEMAN Trustee 30 August 2013
None on record
Dr SETRAG KHORIN KARANFILIAN Trustee 30 August 2013
ARMENIAN COMMUNITY COUNCIL OF THE UNITED KINGDOM
Received: On time
ST YEGHICHE ARMENIAN CHURCH PARISH LTD
Received: On time
RAFFI SARKISSIAN Trustee 30 August 2013
None on record
Zorik Gasparian Trustee
ARMENIAN CHURCH TRUST (UK) LIMITED
Received: On time
KEVORK TAHTAYAN ARMENIAN COMMUNITY SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
ZAREH JEREJIAN Trustee
None on record
Dr STEPAN TATOULIAN Trustee
ARMENIAN COMMUNITY COUNCIL OF THE UNITED KINGDOM
Received: On time
VIKEN HALADJIAN Trustee
ST YEGHICHE ARMENIAN CHURCH PARISH LTD
Received: On time
KEVORK TAHTAYAN ARMENIAN COMMUNITY SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
MATILDA MEGERDICHIAN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.21k £8.63k £10.22k £10.22k £10.22k
Total expenditure £8.40k £8.40k £8.40k £8.40k £8.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 08 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 March 2024 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PO Box 46207
LONDON
W5 1XX
Phone:
07966213788
Website:

No information available