DUCHY HEALTH CHARITY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports charities and other organisations involved in healthcare in Cornwall. It does this by making grants and loans. It also supports research in Cornwall relating to healthcare issues and organises seminars in order to identify current health needs .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cornwall
- Isles Of Scilly
Governance
- 16 September 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr BARBARA VANN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lucy May Anne Walsh | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Warren Burnett | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Jean Roose | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Taylor | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Cassandra Forbes Miller | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gaynor Susan Coley | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Anthony Derek Woolf | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Katy Hutchinson | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tamsyn Jane Anderson | Trustee | 25 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN ALEXANDER EVERS | Trustee | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Williams | Trustee | 21 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £235.08k | £206.53k | £215.89k | £240.35k | £262.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £213.98k | £234.76k | £189.10k | £241.56k | £594.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/07/1976 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/09/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/09/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/02/2016 as amended on 02 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
2.1 The Objects of the Charity are: (a) To promote the health and wellbeing and the prevention and relief of sickness in Cornwall and the Isles of Scilly for the public benefit by such charitable means as the Charity shall from time to time think fit, and in particular (but not exclusively):- (i) by making grants and awards; (ii) by supporting the teaching or training of any persons engaged in any branch of medicine, surgery, nursing or allied services; (iii) by supporting, conducting or promoting research and to disseminate the results to the public; and (iv) by raising awareness of the causes of and ways to prevent sickness.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Duchy Health Charity Ltd
PO Box 352
ST. AUSTELL
PL25 9JE
- Phone:
- 07884 556106
- Email:
- Helen@duchyhealthcharity.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window