Financial history STEVE ROSS FOUNDATION FOR THE ARTS

Charity number: 272007
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £409.85k £374.97k £341.53k £368.29k £536.69k
Total expenditure £467.40k £315.96k £357.02k £438.18k £530.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £71.04k £21.07k £1.09k N/A £152.50k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £225.26k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £101.48k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £135.35k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £74.60k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £530.98k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0