Financial history THE NUTRITION SOCIETY

Charity number: 272071
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.32m £1.52m £1.13m £1.21m £1.26m
Total expenditure £1.56m £1.10m £1.19m £1.82m £1.84m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £73.40k £95.78k £86.27k £62.71k £50.83k
Income - Other trading activities £12.74k £12.06k £13.86k £16.86k £18.81k
Income - Charitable activities £1.21m £1.40m £1.01m £1.11m £1.17m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £24.27k £14.97k £18.06k £16.57k £16.53k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.49m £1.02m £1.10m £1.72m £1.74m
Expenditure - Raising funds £74.85k £75.79k £89.47k £97.02k £96.66k
Expenditure - Governance £39.59k £122.53k £101.23k £104.62k £115.56k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £6.18k £5.75k £5.91k £3.84k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0