Trustees THE NUTRITION SOCIETY
Charity number: 272071

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Maria O'Sullivan | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Andrew Salter | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Thomas Hill | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Mary Ward | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Wendy Hall | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor John Brameld | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Bray | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eileen Gibney | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jayne Woodside | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Jane Hunking | Trustee | 15 July 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.