Financial history DESIGN COUNCIL

Charity number: 272099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.88m £3.61m £4.52m £4.27m £3.64m
Total expenditure £5.56m £3.59m £4.78m £4.15m £3.95m
Income from government contracts £402.63k £253.01k £408.82k N/A £164.90k
Income from government grants £1.77m £1.97m £2.17m £2.45m £2.40m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £727.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.15m £3.61m £4.52m £4.27m £3.64m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.00k £539 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.56m £3.59m £4.78m £4.15m £3.95m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £53.00k £53.00k £63.00k £66.00k £60.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £447.50k £325.00k £299.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0