Financial history ROYAL ARMY PHYSICAL TRAINING CORPS MUSEUM

Charity Number: 272116
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £46.63k £38.30k £34.87k £33.79k £35.89k
Total expenditure £62.50k £34.83k £28.89k £31.13k £42.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £26.64k £28.03k N/A N/A £29.58k