ST CLEMENT DANES PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parents Association for Clement Danes School holding 3-4 events a year to raise money for the school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 06 July 1976: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Thomson | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Ivana Warde | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
SARAH O'DWYER | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Deeley | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
TOBY SUTHERLAND | Trustee | 05 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.19k | £13.19k | £23.63k | £32.26k | £27.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.76k | £22.35k | £21.82k | £31.66k | £33.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 07 June 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 07 June 2021 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 JULY 1976, AS AMENDED OCTOBER 1980, 21 OCTOBER 1987 AND 13 DECEMBER 2004, ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 18 APRIL 2005.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL, AND ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. CLEMENT DANES SCHOOL
CHENIES ROAD
CHORLEYWOOD
RICKMANSWORTH
WD3 6EW
- Phone:
- 01923284169
- Email:
- kevindeeley@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window