FIDDINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintain a community facility for indoor and outdoor activities which are relevant to a small rural parish. Local organisations have preferential hire rates.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £6,100 from 2 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 27 October 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James U'Dell | Chair | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andreia Reis | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Nolan Nolan | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Godden | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan David Scott | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marianne Hendry | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN KINAHAN | Trustee | 02 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW PETER KELVIN WATSON | Trustee | 01 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAUL MATTHEWS | Trustee | 16 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER LOUISE HAWLEY | Trustee | 14 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS CAROL TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
||||||
JANE ZAMBRA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HILARY BURLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL CROSLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.88k | £3.45k | £12.02k | £13.50k | £16.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.21k | £5.61k | £11.55k | £13.58k | £20.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.20k | N/A | £1.60k | £1.60k | £6.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21ST JUNE 1976
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION OR LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF FIDDINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
Church Rd
Fiddington
Bridgwater
Somerset
TA5 1JG
- Phone:
- 01278734624
- Email:
- robin.kinahan@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window