Trustees FIDDINGTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity Number: 272147
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James U'Dell | Chair | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andreia Reis | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Nolan Nolan | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Godden | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan David Scott | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marianne Hendry | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN KINAHAN | Trustee | 02 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW PETER KELVIN WATSON | Trustee | 01 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAUL MATTHEWS | Trustee | 16 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER LOUISE HAWLEY | Trustee | 14 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS CAROL TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
||||||
JANE ZAMBRA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HILARY BURLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL CROSLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.