ASTON VILLAGE SOCIETY VILLAGE HALL COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall for social and recreational purposes and hire for events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £1,420 from 2 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 05 October 1976: Standard registration
- RECREATION GROUND AND PLAYING FIELD, ASTON (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Visram | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Maureen Miller | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Ann O'Hanlon | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Roy Miller | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Fincham | Trustee | 31 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Stimpson | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joan Ostojic | Trustee | 23 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Helena Lovett | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|||||
PETER FRANK STANBURY | Trustee | 14 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Lesley Stanbury | Trustee | 14 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN WOODGET | Trustee | 20 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
CAROL WARREN | Trustee | 20 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr ALAN CANTWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.16k | £17.25k | £25.63k | £25.39k | £23.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.36k | £20.76k | £19.92k | £30.12k | £19.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.65k | £8.65k | £4.38k | £1.65k | £1.42k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 28 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2023
(These accounts |
21 June 2024 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED EXECUTED 31 MAY 1973
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF A RECREATION GROUND AND PLAYING FIELD AND A VILLAGE HALL SPORTS PAVILLION OR SIMILAR BUILDING
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ASTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Wrights Orchard
Brook Field
Aston
Stevenage
SG2 7HR
- Phone:
- 01438880463
- Email:
- p.f.stanbury@herts.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window