TRENHILL LIMITED

Charity Number: 272180
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

provision of Jewish religious facilities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £193,228
Total expenditure: £160,773

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 November 1976: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sydney Samuel Sinitsky Trustee
BEIS YAAKOV GIRLS SCHOOL LIMITED
Received: On time
THE UNION OF ORTHODOX HEBREW CONGREGATIONS
Received: On time
UOHC SUPERVISION LTD
Received: On time
UOHC PROPERTIES LTD
Received: On time
BEIS BRUCHA LTD
Received: On time
CPRM MANAGEMENT LTD
Recently registered
JOSEPH FELD Trustee
THE UNION OF ORTHODOX HEBREW CONGREGATIONS
Received: On time
ALEX EDEL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £62.05k £67.56k £178.32k £122.39k £193.23k
Total expenditure £53.72k £63.35k £66.25k £111.87k £160.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.00k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 01 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 01 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 02 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
16 CRAVEN WALK
LONDON
N16 6BT
Phone:
07973137201
Website:

No information available