TONY GODWIN MEMORIAL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Biennial award established to commemorate the life of Tony Godwin, a prominent publisher in the 1960s/70s. Open to all young people who are UK nationals and working in publishing. The award provides the recipient with the means to spend at least one month as the guest of an American publishing house in order to learn about international publishing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- United States
Governance
- 18 September 1976: Standard registration
- 09 June 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- T G M T (Working name)
- TGMT (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75 | £74 | £75 | £75 | £30 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 04 November 2015 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 30 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24TH SEPTEMBER 1976
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING STUDY KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF LITERATURE AMONG PERSONS ENGAGED IN THE ART AND BUSINESS OF PUBLISHING OF LITERARY WORKS, WHO ARE QUALIFIED PERSONS, BY MEANS OF PRIZES.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window