OBSTETRIC ANAESTHETISTS ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 October 1976: Standard registration
- 20 July 2007: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 20 July 2007: Funds transferred to 1111382 OBSTETRICS ANAESTHETISTS ASSOCIATION
- OAA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2004 | 30/09/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £567.98k | £649.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £510.29k | £561.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2004 | 30/09/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | 27 March 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | 28 March 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2004 | 29 April 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2004 | 29 April 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26TH MARCH 1976 AS AMENDED 23 APRIL 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE HIGHEST STANDARD OF MANAGEMENT AND CARE FOR MOTHER AND BABY THROUGH PRACTICE EDUCATION TRAINING AND RESEARCH IN OBSTETRIC ANAESTHESIA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window