THE LUBRICATORS CHARITABLE TRUST (KNOWN INFORMALLY AS LXIX CHARITABLE FOUNDATION)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Charitable Trust set up by The Guild of the Nineteen Lubricators to 'Help the lame dog over the stile'
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 October 1976: Standard registration
- LUBRICATORS CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- LXIX (Working name)
- THE GUILD OF THE NINETEEN LUBRICATORS (Working name)
- THE LUBRICATORS CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip John Elson | Trustee | 02 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WILLIAM LONG | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan David Gregory | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
roger arthur powdrill | Trustee | 12 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.08k | £24.55k | £39.06k | £50.08k | £63.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.30k | £26.44k | £38.66k | £53.32k | £61.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 17 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 OCTOBER 1976 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 17 JULY 2008.
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR PURPOSES AS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCERTION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Preston
CHIPPENHAM
Wiltshire
SN15 4DX
- Phone:
- 01249 323113
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window