Financial history THE FEDERAL TRUST FOR EDUCATION AND RESEARCH

Charity number: 272241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £20.40k £15.16k £14.29k £15.05k £11.28k
Total expenditure £87.44k £73.50k £49.96k £55.62k £31.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A