CHARITY OF THE DISCALCED CARMELITES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A ministry of prayer,hospitality,retreats,counselling,education and study is carried out.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 November 1976: Standard registration
- DISCALCED CARMELITES (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chinedum Thaddeus Ekuma | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|||||||
Rev Vincent O'Hara | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|||||||
Rev Michael McGoldrick | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|||||||
Rev Alexander Ezechukwu | Trustee | 05 August 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev James Noel Noonan | Trustee | 25 October 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.55k | £8.54k | £8.25k | £4.60k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.30k | £8.72k | £10.64k | £6.69k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 June 2022 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST SEPTEMBER 1976.
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGIOUS OR OTHER CHARITABLE WORKS FOR THE TIME BEING CARRIED ON IN ENGLAND AND WALES BY OR UNDER THE DIRECTION OF THE SOCIETY AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE SUPERIOR SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Avila Carmelite Centre
Bloomfield Avenue
Donnybrook
Dublin
- Phone:
- 01 643 0200
- Email:
- mblakebhill@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window