Financial history THE EVERARD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 272248
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £128.97k £78.39k £61.85k £90.32k £101.62k
Total expenditure £139.35k £96.99k £107.26k £84.25k £47.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A