FRIENDS OF WYVERN SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising for school playground equipment, specialist indoor equipment (including music & sensory therapy equipment) and special treats for the pupils (including a Christmas present).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Dorset
Governance
- 12 November 1976: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF WYVERN SCHOOL (Working name)
- WYVERN SPECIAL SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gemma Brayshaw | Chair | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Megan Capon | Trustee | 20 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Ardagh | Trustee | 20 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Sedgbeer | Trustee | 20 December 2022 |
|
|||||
David Brayshaw | Trustee | 20 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ross Ingram | Trustee | 20 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Seymour | Trustee | 20 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Churchill | Trustee | 20 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY JANET MELLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.81k | £1.32k | £14.70k | £3.15k | £1.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.92k | £7.89k | £12.31k | £10.04k | £15.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 October 2021 | 179 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 26 October 2021 | 179 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 14TH SEPTEMBER 1976, AMENDED 14TH OCTOBER 1983, 19TH MARCH 1996.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCTION AT THE SCHOOL NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Bowleaze Coveway
WEYMOUTH
Dorset
DT3 6PN
- Phone:
- 07879931422
- Email:
- friends@wyvern.dorset.sch.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window