ST PETER'S BISHOPSWORTH CHARITY

Charity Number: 272301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity was established for the advancement of the religious and other charitable purposes in connection with the Church of England including the advancement of public education in the parish of Bishopsworth in 1976

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 January 1977: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • ST PETER'S CHURCH BISHOPSWORTH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev TIMOTHY RICHARD JAMES GODDEN Chair 30 April 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER'S BISHOPSWORTH
Received: On time
Victoria Anne Rees Trustee 19 May 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER'S BISHOPSWORTH
Received: On time

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 14 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 06 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
61 FERNSTEED ROAD
BRISTOL
BS13 8HE
Phone:
01179642734
Email:
No information available