WORLDWIDE MARRIAGE ENCOUNTER ENGLAND AND WALES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Worldwide Marriage Encounter presents training and education programmes for those who the Roman Catholic Church defines as having committed themselves to "The marriage covenant by which a man and woman establish between themselves a partnership for their whole life...". It is in this context that it also presents marriage preparation training programmes, entitled 'Engaged Encounter'.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 December 1976: Standard registration
- M E OR MARRIAGE ENCOUNTER (Working name)
- MARRIAGE ENCOUNTER (ENGLAND) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deirdre Mary Fairman | Trustee | 30 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Russell Edward Fairman | Trustee | 30 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Father Andrew Thomas Burns CSsR | Trustee | 17 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Paul Edward Smith | Trustee | 17 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bianca Maria Smith | Trustee | 10 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Yen Ling Sabine FCCA | Trustee | 05 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.16k | £25.75k | £34.37k | £38.81k | £61.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.91k | £7.05k | £24.77k | £34.08k | £79.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 26 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 26 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 01/10/1976 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 01/06/1981 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 19/03/2009 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 19/08/2009 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 14/03/2010 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 17/03/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROVIDE EDUCATION, ADVICE, GUIDANCE AND DISCUSSIONS FOR MARRIED COUPLES AND COUPLES PREPARING FOR MARRIAGE, IN ORDER THAT THEY MAY HAVE A PROPER UNDERSTANDING OF THE RIGHTS, DUTIES AND RESPONSIBILITIES OF A CHRISTIAN MARRIED LIFE IN ACCORDANCE WITH ROMAN CATHOLIC TRADITION AND AS LAID DOWN BY CANON LAW, AS WELL AS FOR PRIESTS AND MEMBERS OF RELIGIOUS ORDERS WHO WISH TO INCREASE THEIR KNOWLEDGE AND DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR RELATIONAL SKILLS WITH THEIR PARISHIONERS OR IN THEIR COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
68 St. Albans Road
KINGSTON UPON THAMES
Surrey
KT2 5HH
- Phone:
- 02089749741
- Email:
- enquiries@wwme.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window