THE ASIAN STUDENTS CHRISTIAN TRUST

Charity number: 272328
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Children of the Dump (registered as ASCT) has worked in the Philippines since 1975, providing loving care, family support and education to hundreds of deprived children. We currently have over 300 children in our care, many of whom have been abused, abandoned or neglected. We have a residential home for 50 children, a school for 200 4 - 6 year olds and an educational sponsorship scheme.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022

Total income: £240,405
Total expenditure: £199,314

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Philippines

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 November 1976: Standard registration
  • 15 January 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
  • 15 January 2024: Funds transferred to 1198301 THE ASIAN STUDENTS CHRISTIAN TRUST
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • A S C T - MANGO TREE HOUSE (Working name)
  • ASCT-CASHEW TREE SCHOOL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £227.64k £229.69k £197.00k £234.52k £240.41k
Total expenditure £161.07k £204.46k £237.00k £196.13k £199.31k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 August 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 02 November 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 September 2020 On Time