ST MARTINS SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raises money by running events organised by the staff and families at the school. All proceeds are used to further the education and improve the environment of St Martin's Catholic Primary School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
Governance
- 18 November 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zoe De La Pascua | Chair | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Simon Smart | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Lisi | Trustee | 19 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Fuller | Trustee | 31 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.05k | £9.18k | £6.34k | £11.61k | £12.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.88k | £5.45k | £8.15k | £6.23k | £20.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 03 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND JUNE 1976
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE ST MARTIN'S ROMAN CATHOLIC SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISIONS OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Martins RC Primary School
Pendennis Avenue
Caversham
READING
RG4 6SS
- Phone:
- 01189015544
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window