FRIENDS OF CIRENCESTER PARISH CHURCH

Charity Number: 272334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity assists in the care, preservation and adornment of the Parish Church or any other ancient and historic buildings vested in the Cirencester Parochial Church Council, together with their goods and ornaments, and also assists the PCC with the execution of their religious purposes.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £39,350
Total expenditure: £10,521

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 November 1976: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HIS HON JUDGE MICHAEL GEOFFREY JAMES GLEDHILL KC Chair
None on record
Pauline Skinner Trustee 23 June 2024
None on record
SAMANTHA BURT Trustee 23 June 2024
None on record
Phillip John Kerton Trustee 20 May 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CIRENCESTER WITH WATERMOOR AND ST.LAWRENCE
Received: On time
Councillor Mrs Claire Jane Wardell Trustee 19 June 2022
None on record
HUGO KENNARD Trustee 19 June 2022
None on record
John Hobbs Trustee 19 June 2022
None on record
Aileen Star Anderson Trustee 21 June 2020
JOHN JONES
Received: On time
C D CRIPP'S CHARITY
Received: On time
CIRENCESTER UNITED ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE CIRENCESTER VICAR AND CHURCHWARDENS’ CHARITY
Received: On time
PENELOPE MARY FANNA PHILLIPS Trustee 21 June 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CIRENCESTER WITH WATERMOOR AND ST.LAWRENCE
Received: On time
Patrick Charles Bourne Coleman Trustee 14 May 2019
CIRENCESTER STREET PASTORS
Received: On time
STRATTON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Rev'd Canon Graham Edwin Morris Trustee 22 September 2018
JOHN JONES
Received: On time
CIRENCESTER UNITED ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
C D CRIPP'S CHARITY
Received: On time
CIRENCESTER STREET PASTORS
Received: On time
SIR THOMAS ROWE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN EDMONDS CHARITY
Received: On time
POWELL'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
SMITH'S CIRENCESTER POOR CHARITY
Received: On time
THE CIRENCESTER VICAR AND CHURCHWARDENS’ CHARITY
Received: On time
THE CHRISTOPHER AND SARAH ALDAM BOWLY'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Nigel Philip Robbins OBE Trustee 09 May 2017
THE CIRENCESTER VICAR AND CHURCHWARDENS’ CHARITY
Received: On time
CIRENCESTER UNITED ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
C D CRIPP'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN JONES
Received: On time
PETER JOHN COTTEY Trustee 28 November 2015
ST JOHN'S HOSPITAL CIO
Received: On time
ST JOHN'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
UNITED NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
PHILIP MARNER'S CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARLES FREDERICK BASIL WOODD Trustee 28 November 2015
Three Choirs Festival Limited
Received: On time
THE BARN THEATRE PROJECT
Received: On time
JOHN JONES
Received: On time
JOHN EDWARD FRANKLIN Trustee 12 November 2015
None on record
DEIRDRE WADDELL Trustee 01 January 2013
JOHN JONES
Received: On time
Richard Randolph Mullings Trustee
SMITH'S CIRENCESTER POOR CHARITY
Received: On time
THE ANNE BROOKS FAIRGREEN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
GLOUCESTERSHIRE COUNTY HISTORY TRUST CIO
Received: On time
THE WINSTONE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
JOHN JONES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £32.15k £31.81k £48.49k £40.31k £39.35k
Total expenditure £30.25k £24.85k £132.74k £30.15k £10.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 26 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 20 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 06 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Parish Forum
6 West Market Place
CIRENCESTER
Gloucestershire
GL7 2NH
Phone:
01285659317
Email:
No information available
Website:

friendscirencesterparish.org.uk