CRUMBLES CASTLE ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING HELP TO ACCESS FREE, SECURE, INCLUSIVE, OPEN-ACCESS, POSITIVE AND CHALLENGING PLAY OPPORTUNITIES FOR LOCAL CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AGED BETWEEN 6-14 YRS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Islington
Governance
- 20 December 1976: Standard registration
- 06 July 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- CRUMBLES CASTLE (Working name)
- BINGFIELD CASTLE ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.15k | £87.60k | £121.49k | £159.27k | £159.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £106.02k | £109.51k | £122.59k | £83.74k | £83.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22/04/1975 AS AMENDED ON 14/04/2008 AS AMENDED ON 03/07/2012
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE SOUTH ISLINGTON AREA
Area of benefit
SOUTH ISLINGTON AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window