THE ROYAL REGIMENT OF FUSILIERS MUSEUM (ROYAL WARWICKSHIRE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the charity is to operate the museum of The Royal Warwickshire Regiment and its successors in order to portray the story of The Regiment for the educational and informational benefit of all classes of visitor and to make this part of The County history available to all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Solihull
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 20 January 1993: Standard registration
- FUSILIER MUSEUM WARWICK (Working name)
- MUSEUM FUND (Working name)
- R R F MUSEUM (WARWICKS) (Working name)
- THE ROYAL WARWICKSHIRE REGIMENTAL MUSEUM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Paterson | Chair | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
LT COL ANTHONY JOHN MASLEN RICE | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Charles Simon Calder OBE | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Brown | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Billingham BSc Econ | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alex Alexandrou FHEA FIPDA | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
COLONEL BRIAN M GORSKI MBE DL | Trustee | 03 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.58k | £250.99k | £290.47k | £92.30k | £72.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.99k | £149.70k | £247.12k | £228.29k | £107.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.70k | £160.88k | £232.57k | £6.77k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13TH OCTOBER 1976, AND AS REGULATED BY SCHEME DATED 11TH MAY 1993
Charitable objects
UPHOLDING THE TRADITIONS OF THE REGIMENT AND OF PERPETUATING ITS DEEDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pageant House
2 Jury Street
Warwick
CV34 4EW
- Phone:
- 01926258288
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window