THE OAKS CHRISTIAN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Oaks Christian Trust provides excellent facilities through Oakhall Church for the young people associated with it. The youth and activity rooms are fully used by our junior church groups. There is a lively youth club on Friday and Sunday evenings for those aged 13-18. There is a dedicated lounge for those in the 18-30s age group to enable them to meet together throughout the week.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 01 February 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN WILLIAM MAYO | Chair |
|
||||||
Rui Manuel Domingues | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
PAUL DUNCAN BOWKER | Trustee | 20 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BRYDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.35k | £1.11k | £714 | £330 | £3.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £920 | £1.53k | £1.18k | £1.63k | £784 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13TH OCTOBER 1976 SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 29TH SEPTEMBER 1977
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE TRUSTS AND FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES DESIGNED FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS. (A) THE ADMINISTRATION OF ANY PROPERTY OR ESTATE USED OR INTENDED FOR ANY RELIGIOUS OR OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT, INSTITUTION OR WORK. (B) THE SUPPORT OF ANY RELIGIOUS OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR WORK. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE TRUST DEED).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Oaks Christian Trust
181 Chaldon Road
CATERHAM
Surrey
CR3 5PL
- Phone:
- 01883341480
- Email:
- paul.bowker@oakhall.church
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window