Financial history NORTH MOLTON YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity number: 272378
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £13.98k £8.26k £1.45k £20.20k £28.84k
Total expenditure £7.88k £10.96k £1.98k £10.28k £33.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A