THE ALADURA INTERNATIONAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities - Worship - Divine Healing - Counselling - Mediation - Pastoral Care - Hospital Visitations - Social and Cultural Activities - Alms Giving - Donations to Charities - Relief of Poverty - Provide Hall for Community Use
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Ghana
- India
- Nigeria
Governance
- 25 November 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev. Dr. OBE. PHD. FRSA OLUWOLE AREMU ABIOLA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV MOTHER SUPERIOR MARGARET BOLAJI ABIO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOST SENIOR APOSTLE JACOB FAYASE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.89k | £31.52k | £27.86k | £16.02k | £17.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.47k | £12.39k | £15.48k | £11.87k | £30.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 193 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 193 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 559 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 559 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 December 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 March 2022 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 March 2022 | 503 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 March 2022 | 503 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31ST MAY 1974
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31ST MAY 1974.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 31
Norton House
Aytoun Road
London
SW9 0UJ
- Phone:
- 02072745589
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window